National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania et al v. Electric Transit Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania and American Home Assurance Company
Defendant: Electric Transit Incorporated, AAI Corporation, SKODA, a.s. and Skoda Ostrov, S.R.O.
3rd_party_defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2004cv03435
Filed: August 19, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2011 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/3/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
December 13, 2010 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/13/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania et al v. Electric Transit Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Scott L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Scott Louis Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Transit Incorporated
Represented By: Frederick B. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAI Corporation
Represented By: Mark P. Ressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKODA, a.s.
Represented By: Matthew J. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skoda Ostrov, S.R.O.
Represented By: William Wallar Bunting, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Louis Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?