Smith v. Wong

Petitioner: Gregory Calvin Smith
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center, California Appellate Project, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and Office of the State Public Defenders
Case Number: 3:2004cv03436
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/12/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
March 27, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 27, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
November 27, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 69 Motion to Stay. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
May 10, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY. Responses due by 8/1/2013. Replies due by 9/9/2013.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
April 2, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF JOINT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
January 11, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Replies due by 2/15/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
March 6, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
December 20, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL, Attorney Frank O. Bell for Gregory Calvin Smith added. Attorney Harold J. Rosenthal terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 7, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 51 Case Management Statement filed by Michael Martel Case Management Statement set forth in Habeas Local Rule 2254-29(3)due by 1/6/2012, the court will defer scheduling a CMC until after petitioner has filed his traverse. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/7/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
March 23, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Briefing Schedule re 38 Stipulation filed by Gregory Calvin Smith, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 38 Stipulation, 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Exhaust State Court Remedies. Responses due by 3/31/2010. Replies due by 4/30/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
December 17, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for continuance. Revised petition by 1/20/2010 re 33 Stipulation filed by Gregory Calvin Smith. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Calvin Smith
Represented By: Harold J. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Office of the State Public Defenders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Represented By: Lisa Helena Ashley Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?