NGV Gaming, LTD. v. Upstream Point Molate, LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv03955
Filed: September 20, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2009 359 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/15/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
November 24, 2009 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting 313 Motion to Quash Subpoena (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
October 13, 2009 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LEWIS AND ROCA INVOICES [re Docket Nos. 291 and 303] Letter filed by NGV Gaming, LTD. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/13/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 9, 2009 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 276 Letter filed by Harrah's Operating Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/09/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 8, 2009 283 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline Twelve Business Days Until December 8, 2009. No further extensions wil be granted. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/8/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 6, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [Docket No. 267] Letter filed by Guidiville Band of Pomo Indians, [Docket No. 251] Letter filed by Harrah's Operating Company, Inc., NGV Gaming, LTD., [Docket No. 269] Letter filed by NGV Gaming, LTD. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/06/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 3, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE ON HEARING DATE OF NGV'S 225 MOTION for Discovery Clarification of 10-5-05 Order. Reply due by 9/18/2009. Motion Hearing prev.set for 9/18/9 at 9:30 AM has been re-set to 9/25/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/03/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 13, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 189 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 203 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 220 Motion to Strike ; granting 238 Motion for Leave to File (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
February 2, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Trial Setting Conference set for 4/17/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/2/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
November 18, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 165 Motion to Stay (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
September 5, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Status Conference set for 9/19/08 is continued to 11/14/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/4/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 2, 2008 159 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA MANDATE: The judgment of this Court, entered 6/26/08, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. FOR THE COURT re 134 Notice (Other) filed by NGV Gaming, LTD. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NGV Gaming, LTD. v. Upstream Point Molate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?