Gregory v. Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv04293
Filed: October 12, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2009 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 54(b) certification. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
October 30, 2008 185 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting extension of the page limit re 181 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 825 Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/29/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
September 22, 2008 180 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 179 filed by International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 825 Pension Fund. The Notices and Insert shall advise the recently identified CESPP participants who are Class Members that the deadline for them to request exclusion, or to object or comment on the proposed Settlement and/or Motion for Attorneys' fees and expenses is set for 10/29/2008. The Settlement Fairness Hearing is hereby adjourned and re-scheduled for 12/3/2008 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/22/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?