Princeton Stategic Investment Fund LLC, et al. v. United States of America

Case Number: 3:2004cv04310
Filed: October 12, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 19, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 11, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/11/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
August 18, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 Stipulation filed by Presidio Growth LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Stategic Investment Fund LLC, et al. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?