Barnett v. County of Contra Costa et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv04437
Filed: October 20, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2011 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/18/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
February 1, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue the motion for summary judgment briefing schedule and hearing date. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/01/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
June 24, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing plaintiff Chan's claims. Adeline Chan terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010 (rbe, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting re 192 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend & Granting re 198 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before 06/23/2010. The parties shall appear for a further case management conference on 06/28/10 at 1:30 PM and file a joint case management conference statement on or before 06/23/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed 6/18/2010)
April 23, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: hearings and briefing schedules. Motion Hearing cotninued to 6/28/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/22/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
March 11, 2010 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference & Granting Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants May File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's re 157 Summary Judgment and re 172 Class Certification Orders by 04/05/2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/11/2010. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 24, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: (179) Defendant Contra Costa County's request for expedited case management conference in Case No. C04-4437 TEH. Parties in both Case No. C04-4437 TEH and Case No. C04-5365 TEH shall meet and confer and file joint case management conference statements by 03/08/10. Case management conferences to be held in both cases on 03/15/10 at 1:30 PM. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
January 27, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 4/12/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/26/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
November 30, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Pendency of Class Action. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/30/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 8, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension of time for reply brief and vacating hearing date on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Reply due on or before 10/15/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/08/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 5, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend briefing schedule to file defendants' opposition. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/05/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 21, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: briefing and hearing schedule. The hearing for the Motion for Class Certification is set for 10/26/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/21/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 11, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 139 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
August 6, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: briefing and hearing schedule on motions for class certification and summary judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/06/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?