Scharlatt v. Barnhart

Case Number: 3:2004cv04724
Filed: November 8, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION re 29 Stipulation filed by Jo Anne B. Barnhart. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/19/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
December 12, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO ALTER FEE AWARD. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/12/08. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
November 21, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part 18 Motion for Attorney Fees (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scharlatt v. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?