Taylor et al v. City of Oakland et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv04843
Filed: November 15, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal upon Settlement with prejudice. Within 120 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shallbe vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/6/13. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 4, 2013 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: continuation of settlement conference and motion filing deadline.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/4/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
March 20, 2012 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
April 21, 2010 182 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING SUBMISSIONS DEADLINE; Deadline for submitting Memoranda of findings of fact and law continued to 4/26/2010; Further hearing re Bench Trial continued to 4/30/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/21/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 10, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for and WRIT OF TESTIFICANDUM as to Mark Engram to be produced for testimony for the dates from 3/17/2010 thru 3/19/2010; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/10/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
January 29, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re (145 in 3:04-cv-04843-MHP) Stipulation To Continue Pretrial Conference filed by City of Oakland Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/28/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 14, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court EQUIPMENT ORDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/13/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 14, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER Re: Plaintiff Young's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel in case 3:06-cv-02426-MHP; granting in part and denying in part (101) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:04-cv-04843-MHP; granting in part and denying in part (87) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:05-cv-03110-MHP, C07-4179 MHP and C08-4255 MHP. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
February 24, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/24/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 20, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES: Jury Trial reset for 6/30/2009 08:30 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2009 02:30 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/16/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 13, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying (67) Motion to Certify Class in case 3:05-cv-03110-MHP (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
November 14, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFFS: Fact discovery extended to 1/6/2009; Expert designation by 1/13/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/14/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?