Google Inc. v. Skyline Software Systems Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Google Inc. filed a declaratory judgment action against defendant Skyline Software Systems, Inc. regarding defendant\'s U.S. Patent No. 6,496,189 entitled \"Remote landscape display and pilot training.\" Defendant had previously sued Keyhole, Inc., a company acquired by plaintiff, for patent infringement regarding the same patent.

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Skyline Software Systems Inc.
Case Number: 3:2004cv04922
Filed: November 18, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2005 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
Plft Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & ORDER: Signed by Judge Phyllis J Hamilton on 1/3/05. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2005)
December 27, 2004 14
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Google Inc. (Kemeny, Kent) (Filed on 12/27/2004)
December 13, 2004 9
MOTION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Skyline Software Systems Inc.. (Saferstein, Harvey) (Filed on 12/13/2004)
December 10, 2004 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 12/10/04. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2004)
December 9, 2004 7
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2004)
December 7, 2004 6
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Kemeny, Kent) (Filed on 12/7/2004)
December 1, 2004 4
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Infringement and Invalidity with Exhibit A; Summons in a Civil Case; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference (standing order, etc.); US District Court Northern California/ECF Registration Information for Trial; Dispute Resolution Procedures; and Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial served on Registered Agent, Tina L. Rogers of Corporation Service Company, for SKYLINE SOFTWARE SYSTEMS, INC. on November 23, 2004, filed by Google Inc.. (Woo, Darryl) (Filed on 12/1/2004)
November 19, 2004 3
REPORT on the filing of an action regarding PATENT NONINFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2004)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Skyline Software Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Michael Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Software Systems Inc.
Represented By: Harvey Irving Saferstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?