City and County of San Francisco v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company

Case Number: 3:2004cv05307
Filed: December 15, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
October 30, 2008 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 191 Joint Case Management Statement filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/30/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 22, 2008 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/22/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City and County of San Francisco v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?