United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 941 East Highway 20, Upper Lake, California et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv05401
Filed: December 21, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2011 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT 32 Semi-automatic Baretta pursuant to notice 88 ; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/20/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
September 7, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel GRANTING plaintiff's 83 Motion for Summary Judgment and Forfeiture AND ORDERING that defendant real property located at 941 and 975 East Highway 20, Upper Lake, CA is hereby forfeited to plaintiff United States. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 20, 2006 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/20/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2006)
July 19, 2006 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES CR 04-0317 MHP, C 04-5401 MHP, AND C 05-0897 AND NOT RELATING C 06-4264 VRW; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/18/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 941 East Highway 20, Upper Lake, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?