Dilbert v. Potter

Case Number: 3:2005cv00087
Filed: January 5, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT re 116 Transcript Designation filed by Clifford Dilbert. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
April 9, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Transcript of 4/9/09 Hearing. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/9/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 23, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTFICANDUM re 98 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/23/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
January 27, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying Motion to Appoint Counsel 60 (amended to add signature and correct signature date);denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
October 31, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Produce Transcript. Signed by HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/31/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilbert v. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?