Schmidt v. Contra Costa County et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00197
Filed: January 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 170 Motion for Discovery; denying 171 Motion for Discovery (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 7, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 109 Letter filed by Denise Schmidt. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 2, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPY re 109 Letter filed by Denise Schmidt. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 22, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER re 93 Letter filed by Ken Torre, Barry Baskin, Laurel Brady, Thomas Maddox, Lois Haight. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 15, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER re 94 Letter filed by Denise Schmidt. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/15/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 25, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/25/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
April 13, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING THE DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE from 6/24/2010 to 8/5/2010 at 10:00 AM, re doc 87 filed by Denise Schmidt, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County Superior Court, Ken Torre, Barry Baskin, Judicial Council of California, Laurel Brady, Thomas Maddox, Lois Haight. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/13/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
February 2, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re doc 82 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Denise Schmidt, Contra Costa County, Ken Torre, Barry Baskin, Laurel Brady, Thomas Maddox, Lois Haight. Fact Discovery cutoff: 6/1/2010. Dispositive Motions Hearing: 6/24/2010 at 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference/Set Trial Date: 8/26/2010 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/1/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 25, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The deadline for the Court Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's request for production of documents is extended to 2/4/2010 re doc 84 Letter filed by Ken Torre, Barry Baskin, Laurel Brady, Thomas Maddox, Lois Haight, doc 83 Proposed Order filed by Ken Torre, Barry Baskin, Laurel Brady, Thomas Maddox, Lois Haight. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/25/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 11, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to respond to Plaintiff's request for production of documents to 1/25/2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/11/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
February 11, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating the case management conference currently set for 2/19/2009 pending the decision of the court of appeals on defendants' petition re 55 filed by Contra Costa County Superior Court, Ken Torre, Barry Baskin, Laurel Brady, Thomas Maddox, Lois Haight. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/11/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?