Guizar v. Woodford et al
Case Number: 3:2005cv00557
Filed: February 7, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CERTIFICATE THAT APPEAL IS TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 17, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REISSUE SUMMONS AND UNITED STATES MARSHAL TO SERVE DEFENDANTS WOHLWEND, COZIAHR, AND JAMES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 2, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 64 MOTION FOR STAY; DISMISSING DEFENDANTS BASSO AND POTTIEGER; DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND UNITED STATES MARSHAL TO SERVE DEFENDANTS COZIAHR, JAMES AND WOHLWEND. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United State s Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint in this matter and all attachments thereto (Docket No.1), and a copy of this order upon defendants Cozahr, James and Wohlwend at the addresses provided by plaintiff in Docket No. 60. Within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment or other dispositive motion with respect to the claims found to be congnizable. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 55 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; GRANTING 50 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING 48 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR PROVIDE CURRENT ADDRESS FOR UNSERVED DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 8, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guizar v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?