Guglielmino et al v. McKee Foods Corporation

Case Number: 3:2005cv00620
Filed: February 10, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The releases and covenants not to sue by the class representatives and class members, as set forth in Sections 16 and 18 of the Settlement Agreement between the parties, are approved by the Court, are binding on the class representatives and class members, and are hereby incorporated by reference and made a part of this Order of Dismissal as though fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/20/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
October 15, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting preliminary approval of the proposed settlement. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 17, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING on the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed settlement, doc 93, to 9/24/2009 at 10:00 AM filed by McKee Foods Corporation. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/17/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
March 11, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 89 Status Report filed by Carlo Guglielmino, Briant Chun-Hoon. Having advised the court that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause of action be dismissed with prejudice, pro vided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/11/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guglielmino et al v. McKee Foods Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?