APL Co. Pte. Ltd. v. UK Aerosols Ltd. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00646
Filed: February 11, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 230 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; For the foregoing reasons, APL's motion for attorneys' fees is GRANTED. Under Singapore law, plaintiff, as the prevailing party, is entitled to costs, which include both reasonable attorneys' fees and reasonable expenses incurred in litigating this action. The overall award of attorneys' fees is $735,374.08, which is the sum of $701,139.08 in reasonable billable hours an d the $34,235.00 in costs expended in the litigation.In accordance with the above, defendants U.G. and Kamdar shall pay over to plaintiff APL the total amount of $735,374.08 within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/31/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
September 3, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: Plaintiff APL's Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 09/03/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
January 20, 2010 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 218 MOTION Administrative Relief under Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to File a Sur-reply re 205 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 217 Reply to Response to Motion MOTION Administrative Relief under Local Rule 7-11 for Leave to File a Sur-reply re 205 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 217 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Marilyn Patel on 1/20/10. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APL Co. Pte. Ltd. v. UK Aerosols Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?