Dunlap v. Randow et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00665
Filed: February 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 7, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 49 Notice (Other) filed by Ralph Randow. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/09. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
September 24, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/24/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlap v. Randow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?