United States of America -v- $1,379,879.09

Case Number: 3:2005cv00946
Filed: March 7, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/2/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 14, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 102 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 14, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 9, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/9/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
April 22, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 94 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America -v- $1,379,879.09
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?