Billingsley et al v. Center for Claims Resolution, Inc., et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00970
Filed: March 8, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
June 30, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 10/1/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 4, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
February 9, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANING 24 Stipulation TO CONTINUE Case Management Conference to 3/22/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/9/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 22, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference continued to 3/1/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/21/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
August 10, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER that the action on this conditional remand order be remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. In Re: Asbestos Products Liability Litigation (No. VI) MDL 875. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley et al v. Center for Claims Resolution, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?