DR Management, LLC et al v. United States of America, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01010
Filed: March 10, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502 IRS:Enforcement of tax liens
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The adjustments set forth in the Notices of Final Partnership Administrative Adjustment issued on October 15, 2004, with respect to tax returns filed by DR Management, LLC, and DR Acquisitions I, LLC, for the taxable year ending December 31, 2000, are sustained except as modified by agreement between the plaintiff Tax Matters Partner and the Tax Division, Department of Justice. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 18, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SEVENTH STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HERAING DATE. The Summary Judgment Hearing is continued from August 21, 2009 to September 25, 2009. The deadline to file Pretrial Filings and Motions in Limine is contin ued from September 11, 2009 to October 16, 2009. The deadline to file Opposition to Motion in Limines is continued from September 18, 2009 to October 23, 2009. The Pretrial Conference is continued from October 6, 2009 to November 10, 2009. The Trial is continued from October 26, 2009 to November 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
April 9, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SIXTH STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HERAING DATE. The Summary Judgment Hearing is continued from April 24, 2009 to August 21, 2009. The deadline to file Pretrial Filings and Motions in Limine is continued f rom May 11, 2009 to September 11, 2009. The deadline to file Opposition to Motion in Limines is continued from May 18, 2009 to September 18, 2009. The Pretrial Conference is continued from June 2, 2009 to October 6, 2009. The Trial is continued from June 22, 2009 to October 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
December 22, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FIFTH STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION HERAING DATE. The Summary Judgment Hearing is continued from January 23, 2009 to April 24, 2009. The deadline to file Pretrial Filings and Motions in Limine is continued t o May 11, 2009. The deadline to file Opposition to Motion in Limines is continued to May 18, 2009. The Pretrial Conference is continued from March 3, 2009 to June 2, 2009. The Trial is continued from March 23, 2009 to June 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
February 5, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 5, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DR Management, LLC et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?