Langendorf v. Kirkland

Case Number: 3:2005cv01629
Filed: April 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILTY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
October 27, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REPOPENING ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED PETITION, TO SHOW CAUSE, GRANTING MOTION AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/27/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008) Modified on 10/28/2008 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER. The Petition for Writ of Mandamus is denied without prejudice to the filing of a new petition if the district court has not issued an order reopening docket no. 05-1629 JSW within 90 days. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langendorf v. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?