Tarlecki v. bebe stores, inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv01777
Filed: April 28, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Plaintiffs' instant motion for final approval of the settlement agreement, and award of attorneys' fees, costs and incentive awards is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' counsel shall be awarded att orneys' fees in the amount of $200,000 and costs in the amount of $30,245.37. Named plaintiffs shall be awarded $400 each except for lead plaintiff Lauren Tarlecki, who is awarded $4,000. The residual amount, i.e., the diff erence between the $290,000 in attorneys fees, costs and incentive fees agreed between the parties and the actual amount awarded, or $47,354.63, shall be awarded to the Volunteer Legal Services Program of the Bar Association of San Francisco. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re ADDITIONAL SUBMISSIONS AND MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 2, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 7/20/2009 to file CMC statement; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/2/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 14, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 92 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval, Attorneys' Fees, and Incentive Awards without prejudice; Further Hearing set for 8/3/2009 at 2:00 pm; SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarlecki v. bebe stores, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?