Dale v. Fernandez et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01842
Filed: May 4, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 155 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
July 27, 2012 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 152 STIPULATION TAKING JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL OFF CALENDAR AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE Status Conference set for 8/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 16, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 146 STIPULATION RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM AND ORDER TO TRANSFER INMATE DEXTER E. DALE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 11, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S INTENDED VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 11, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
June 20, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING JURY SELECTION. Jury Selection set for 8/1/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/20/12 (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 13, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 6, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING as to 85 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
March 26, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/26/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 21, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 8, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 8, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
March 1, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 66 STIPULATION TO HOLD DEPOSITIONS AFTER DISCOVERY CUTOFF. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
November 1, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
September 27, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING PRO BONO COUNSEL AND SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before the Hon. Jeffrey S White; Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011; Signed by Judge Jeffrey S White on 8/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 CertServ)(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
July 8, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
January 6, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS AND SETTING MOTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
November 5, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/5/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 6, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to transport Dexter Dale for settlement conference on October 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/6/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale v. Fernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?