Sixty-Three Strategic Investment Funds et al v. United States of America

Case Number: 3:2005cv01996
Filed: May 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6103 Taxpayer wrongful disclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS PREMATURE RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF STUART A. SMITH re 14 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Report and Testimony of Stuart Smith filed by United States of America. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 7, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
July 31, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Discovery due by 9/17/2012. Motions due by 11/19/2012. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 31, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
June 21, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 21, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sixty-Three Strategic Investment Funds et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?