Jenkins v. Adams

Case Number: 3:2005cv02003
Filed: May 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 64 65 Motions for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (Attachments: # 1 CertServ) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
January 4, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied re 63 Notice of Appeal; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/4/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
November 15, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION OF HABEAS CORPUS; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/12/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
June 30, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 49 Motion for Sanctions; Traverse to be filed not later than 8/2/2010; Supplemental responses to traverse to be filed not later than 9/3/2010 (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
January 20, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting extension of time to file response.. Signed by Judge Marilyn Patel on 1/20/10. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 18, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent to file responsive pleading by 1/19/2010; Traverse to be filed within thirty days thereafter; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/17/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) *copy of this order and the petition sent to respondent and to CA State Attorney General's Office by certified mail*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?