Woods et al v. DC-3 Entertainment LLLP et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02287
Filed: June 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/18/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
January 26, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 159 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Settlement Conference set for 5/20/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/26/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
October 3, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 3, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods et al v. DC-3 Entertainment LLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?