Turner v. Rupf et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02297
Filed: June 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for Plaintiff's attendance at settlement conference at Solano State Prison on March 21, 2011.Signed by Magistrate Judge Vadas on 2/23/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 27, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Certificate of Service (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 21, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 154 plaintiff's Application for an investigator and legal assistant, counsel (Attachments: # 1 CertServ) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 7, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 148 plaintiff's request for recusal; Plaintiff to file CMC statement not later than 1/28/2011; Deposition of plaintiff to be commenced no later than 2/10/2011; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 CertServ)(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
March 9, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 115 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 123 Motion to Strike (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
January 20, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER rescheduling the Motion Hearing to 3/1/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 01/15/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
April 13, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 110 Proposed Order filed by Edward Turner. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/13/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
January 16, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 4/27/2009 03:00 PM, before the Honorable Marilyn Hall Patel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/15/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
November 4, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re-Scheduling Settlement Conference for 1/23/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/4/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
September 10, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER instructing Corcoran State Prison to allow access to telephone for plaintiff with counsel and forwarding appropriate mail to counsel; Plaintiff to file Rule 26 disclosures by 9/29/2008; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Rupf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?