Hitachi, Ltd. v. Proview International Holdings, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Hitachi, Ltd. alleged that Defendants Proview International Holdings, Ltd., Proview Electronics Co. Ltd. and Proview Technology, Inc. makes, uses, import ants, distributes, offers for sale and/or sells certain computer monitor products in the United States which infringe on U.S Patent No. 6,247,090 entitled "Display Apparatus Enabled to Control Communicability With An External Computer Using Identification Information," U.S Patent No. 6,549,970 entitled "Display Unit With Controller Enabling Bi-directional Communication With Computer" and U.S. Patent No. 6,513,088 entitled "Display Unit and Method Enabling Bi-Directional Communication With Video Source."

Case Number: 3:2005cv02305
Filed: June 6, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2006 Filing 50 REPORT on the termination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/06/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 5, 2006 Filing 48 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Akerley, Stephen) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
December 2, 2005 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/2/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/2/2005). Further Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2006 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter N/A.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/2/2005)
November 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/18/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2005)
November 16, 2005 Filing 45 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 11/16/2005) Modified on 11/17/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2005 Filing 44 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order [Proposed] by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 11/11/2005)
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/24/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2005)
October 24, 2005 Filing 42 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/24/2005) re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Proview International Holdings, Inc. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) The Court resets case management conference for 12/2/05 at 8:30 am for C-05-2305, C-05-2301 C-05-2302. (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2005) Modified on 10/25/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2005 Filing 41 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Hitachi, Ltd., Proview International Holdings, Inc., Proview Electronics Company, Ltd, Proview Technology, Inc., Proview Technology, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Proview Electronics Company, Ltd, Hitachi, Ltd. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 10/17/2005)
October 14, 2005 Filing 40 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) and [Proposed] Order filed by Hitachi, Ltd., Proview International Holdings, Inc., Proview Electronics Company, Ltd, Proview Technology, Inc., Proview Technology, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Proview Electronics Company, Ltd, Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 10/14/2005)
October 7, 2005 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005)
October 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/03/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2005)
October 4, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 33 Stipulation filed by Hitachi, Ltd., Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2005 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/03/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2005)
September 30, 2005 Filing 36 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byProview International Holdings, Inc.. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 9/30/2005)
September 27, 2005 Filing 35 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of Proview Electronics Co., Ltd. byHitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/27/2005)
September 27, 2005 Filing 34 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of Proview Technology, Inc. byHitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/27/2005)
September 23, 2005 Filing 33 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Case Management Conferences in Related Cases to October 14, 2005 by Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 23, 2005 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 23, 2005 Filing 31 Proposed Order re 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Proview's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 23, 2005 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Elaine M. Heal in Opposition to 29 Memorandum in Opposition to Proview's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byHitachi, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 23, 2005 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byHitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 21, 2005 Filing 28 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Proview Technology, Inc. and Proview Elec. Co. (DeBruine, Sean) (Filed on 9/21/2005)
September 20, 2005 Filing 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Hitachi, Ltd. (Akerley, Stephen) (Filed on 9/20/2005)
September 7, 2005 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Proview International Holdings, Inc.. (Kim, Sang Hui) (Filed on 9/7/2005)
September 7, 2005 Filing 25 Declaration of Elina Hui in Support of 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byProview International Holdings, Inc.. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Kim, Sang Hui) (Filed on 9/7/2005)
September 7, 2005 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Proview International Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kim, Sang Hui) (Filed on 9/7/2005)
September 7, 2005 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Hitachi, Ltd. byProview Electronics Company, Ltd. (Kim, Sang Hui) (Filed on 9/7/2005)
September 7, 2005 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Hitachi, Ltd. byProview Technology, Inc.. (Kim, Sang Hui) (Filed on 9/7/2005)
August 16, 2005 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Hitachi, Ltd.. Service waived by Proview International Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 7/9/2005, answer due 9/7/2005; Proview Electronics Company, Ltd waiver sent on 7/9/2005, answer due 9/7/2005; Proview Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 7/9/2005, answer due 9/7/2005. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 8/16/2005)
July 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Stipulation filed by Hitachi, Ltd.,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2005)
July 8, 2005 Filing 19 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 7/8/2005)
July 8, 2005 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hitachi, Ltd. re 16 Order Relating Case,, 17 Clerks Notice and ECF Registration Instructions (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 7/8/2005)
July 5, 2005 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2005 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Order Setting Case Management Conference# 2 Standing order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2005)
July 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASE C-05-2302 and C-05-2305 to lead case C-05-2301CRB. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be renoticed by the moving party before the newly assinged judge. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/01/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hitachi, Ltd. re 10 Order Reassigning Case, 11 Notice of Appearance, 12 Order, 4 Order, 7 Ex Parte Application for Appointment of International Process Server, 8 Proposed Order, 9 Clerks Notice of Impending Reassignment and ECF Registration Information Handout (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 27, 2005 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hitachi, Ltd. re 1 Complaint,, 2 Notice (Other), 3 ADR Scheduling Order, Summons Issued,, Case Referred to ECF PROVIEW TECHNOLOGY INC. a California corporation (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 6/27/2005)
June 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney JOSEPH H. PAQUIN, JR. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED. Referred to CRB for related case determination. re 4 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/22/05. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2005)
June 21, 2005 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Alberti (Alberti, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V Trumbull no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on June 21, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 21, 2005 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 21, 2005 Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order to all parties of record. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 20, 2005 Filing 8 Proposed Order re 7 Ex Parte Application for Appointment of International Process Server by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 6/20/2005)
June 20, 2005 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Appointment of International Process Server filed by Hitachi, Ltd.. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 6/20/2005)
June 20, 2005 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Hitachi, Ltd. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge for Trial and Disposition. (Heal, Elaine) (Filed on 6/20/2005)
June 17, 2005 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid receipt # 5512616) for attorney JOSEPH H. PAQUIN filed by Hitachi, Ltd.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED. re 2 Notice (Other) filed by Hitachi, Ltd. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/17/05. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005)
June 17, 2005 Received Document (PROPOSED) ORDER re 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Hitachi, Ltd.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005)
June 10, 2005 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2005)
June 6, 2005 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2005. Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2005 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2005)
June 6, 2005 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case (C03-05792WHA Top Victory Electronics, et al v Hitachif, Ltd) by Hitachi, Ltd. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Proview International Holdings, Inc., Proview Electronics Company, Ltd, Proview Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 3373005.). Filed byHitachi, Ltd.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2005 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2005 Summons Issued as to Proview Electronics Company, Ltd. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 Summons Issued as to Proview Technology, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 Summons Issued as to Proview International Holdings, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitachi, Ltd. v. Proview International Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?