Moyle et al v. Contra Costa County et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02324
Filed: June 8, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2016 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING SETTLEMENT FUNDS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 18, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
March 19, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/19/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 24, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR RESETTING OF EXPEDITED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case management conference date of 3/5/10 at 1:30 PM has been advanced to 3/4/10 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/24/10. (klh, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 104 Letter filed by Katherine Ermitano, Russell Moyle for Ex Parte Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Protective Order for Disclosure of Juvenile Records. Hearing set for 2/13/9 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyle et al v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?