Tierno v. Rite Aid Corporation

Case Number: 3:2005cv02520
Filed: June 21, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: individuals incorrectly listed as class members. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/27/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
January 26, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER changing briefing and hearing dates. The hearing on the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is continued to 7/20/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/26/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 23, 2009 209 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/23/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 16, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER changing briefing schedule and hearing date. Motion Hearing continued to 3/2/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/16/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 16, 2008 193 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 3/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/15/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tierno v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?