Strom v. Scios, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Strom, United States of America, State of California, State of Florida, State of Illinois, State of Massachusetts and State of Texas
Defendant: Scios, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2005cv03004
Filed: March 9, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/18/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Status Report due by 11/18/2013. Status Conference reset for 11/22/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Status Report due by 10/11/2013. Status Conference reset for 10/18/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER re 198 Status Report filed by United States of America Status Report due by 8/30/2013. Status Conference set for 9/6/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER re 196 Status Report filed by United States of America Status Report due by 8/16/2013. Status Conference reset for 8/23/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re 194 Status Report filed by United States of America Status Report due by 7/5/2013. Status Conference set for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/10/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER re 192 Status Report filed by United States of America Status Report due by 5/17/2013. Status Conference set for 5/24/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/10/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER re 190 Status Report filed by United States of America Status Report due by 3/29/2013. Status Conference reset for 4/5/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re 188 Status Report filed by United States of America Status Report due by 12/14/2012. Status Conference reset for 12/21/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/11/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER vacating dates re 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Scios, Inc. Joint status report due by 9/14/2012. Status Conference set for 9/28/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER regarding case schedule re 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States of America Motions due by 8/15/2012. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/22/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Cha rles R. Breyer. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 9/21/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/18/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 175 STIPULATION Regarding Production of Claims Data and Expert Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/3/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 159 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (Dkt. No. 152). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/9/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS NOVEMBER 3, 2011 LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/3/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE: OCTOBER 28, 2011 JOINT LETTERS. Discovery Hearing set for 11/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/1/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Regarding The United States' Requests For Production 109-111 re: 148 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/28/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Order Regarding Withheld and Redacted Documents re 146 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/21/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Dkt. No. 138). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re 140 Stipulation filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Scios, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/7/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE: DR. LIPICKY TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/6/2011. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER 15, 2011 AND SEPTEMBER 17, 2011 JOINT LETTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/19/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE: SEPTEMBER 13, 2011 HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/6/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER regarding expert discovery re 118 Stipulation filed by United States of America. 2010 Revisions to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(1)(2) and (b)(4) regarding expert discovery apply to this case. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/18/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re 112 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/27/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/11. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER to Vacate CMC re 85 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/2/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re: Filing of Second Amended Answer re 81 Stipulation filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Scios, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER to appear by telephone re 78 Notice filed by Joe Strom. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/8/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER extending time to respond and resetting CMC re 70 Proposed Order filed by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Scios, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/8/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 53 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER to Stay Discovery until 2/05/2010 re 62 Stipulation filed by United States of America Further Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/10/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of 15 Pages re 56 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/20/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strom v. Scios, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Strom
Represented By: Marcella Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Julie Ann Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Adelina Orozco Berumen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scios, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Seth Cashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Seth Cashman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?