Bottoms et al v. ATKN Company of California et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03045
Filed: July 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlement. Within 45 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
January 14, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 2/6/09 @ 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
February 7, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 4/25/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/6/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bottoms et al v. ATKN Company of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?