Houston et al v. Cintas Corporation

Case Number: 3:2005cv03145
Filed: August 3, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 25, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
April 3, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 32 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Putative Class Claims. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 18, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT NOTICE, OF PUTATIVE CLASS CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston et al v. Cintas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?