Rausini v. United States of America

Case Number: 3:2005cv03249
Filed: August 10, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JULY 13, 2012 STATUS CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
November 23, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting stay.(counsel is reminded that all futher filings should be made in the criminal case only) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
December 10, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Mark Vermeulen as counsel of record 14 for Walter Pierre Rausini; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/10/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
August 17, 2005 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 2255 briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/16/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rausini v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?