Nolan v. Heald College et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03399
Filed: August 22, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to be prepared to discuss the Laffey matrix at the 11/30/2010 hearing. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/22/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
October 14, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating bench trial and directing parties to inform the court not later than October 23, 2009 whether they consent to referral to a magistrate judge. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan v. Heald College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?