Morales v. Scribner et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03545
Filed: September 1, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/9/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 12, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
November 25, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 25, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Scribner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?