Janda v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03729
Filed: September 15, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 115 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 26, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 26, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
December 19, 2008 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 111 Stipulation Changing Briefing Schedule and Date re Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 19, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 7, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 85 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
September 9, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; MOTION TO TRANSFER; AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janda v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?