Curtis v. Shapiro et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03883
Filed: September 26, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND PETITION FOR REHEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 7, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR REHEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
September 28, 2005 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: application to proceed in forma pauperis; requiring plaintiff to file no later than October 21, 2005, a supplemental brief demonstrating that the instant action is not barred by the doctrine of res judicata. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/28/2005. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Shapiro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?