Bolwell et al v. Pfizer Inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv03902
Filed: September 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 1, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re-setting hearings and further CMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/29/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING & FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE,Reset Deadlines as to (3569 in 3:05-md-01699-CRB) MOTION to Dismiss (27 in 3:11-cv-00310-CRB) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6); M emorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof. Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/16/2012 10:00 AM. Motion to Dismiss hearing set for 3/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/8/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
October 31, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding remaining plaintiffs and setting further CMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/28/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolwell et al v. Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?