The Regents of the University of California et al v. Dakocytomation California Inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv03955
Filed: September 29, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2009 405 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Counsel to notify court by 7/31/2009 of dismissal/further status; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/13/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
June 19, 2009 403 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: the parties shall notify the Court by 7/10/09 of the status of the litigation if no dismissal of the action is filed by that date.. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/19/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
May 22, 2009 401 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE(S); Notice of Settlement; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/22/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 19, 2009 399 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: defendants' motion in limine to preclude plaintiffs from relying on evidence to support written description and enablement is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Dako's motion to preclude p laintiffs from relying on Section VI to support a priority date of January 16, 1986 at trial is GRANTED. Dako's motion to preclude plaintiffs from relying on Section VI to support a priority date of December 4, 1986 at trial is DENIED. Dako's motion to preclude plaintiffs from relying on the blocking method disclosed in Sealey in defense to Dako's written description and enablement claims is also DENIED. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 15, 2009 380 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED EQUIPMENT ORDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/15/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 1, 2009 373 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding INFRINGMENT; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/30/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 30, 2009 372 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: plaintiffs motion for summary judgment of infringement of the 841 patent under the doctrine of equivalents is DENIED (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 22, 2009 353 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Defendants' motion for summary judgment of invalidity of the '841 patent is DENIED; defendants' motion for summary judgment of unenforceability for inequitable conduct is DENIED; and pl aintiffs' motion for summary judgment of no inequitable conduct is DENIED.Plaintiffs' motion to strike the report of Dr. Singer is DISMISSED as moot, as the report has been later sworn to, Dr. Singer confirmed the opinions expressed therein, and the objected-to testimony did not form a basis upon which the court decided the parties' respective motions for summary judgment. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 14, 2009 351 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/13/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 3, 2009 319 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 3/20/2009 for compel of expert discovery; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/27/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
November 25, 2008 212 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BIFURCATION OF DAMAGES; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/24/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of California et al v. Dakocytomation California Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?