Jones v. Pasta Pelican, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04245
Filed: October 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING APRIL 15 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 12, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 2, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES to April 15, 2010,. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 31, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
February 18, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 18 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 18, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 16, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISPUTE OVER DEFENDANTS' COMPLIANCE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 16, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
December 29, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 29, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
October 19, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 SCHEDULING ORDER-ADA (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Pasta Pelican, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?