Moreno et al v. AutoZone, Inc

Case Number: 3:2005cv04432
Filed: November 1, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2009 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 325 Motion for Sanctions (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
November 13, 2009 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing on motion for sanctions re 336 Stipulation filed by Bailey Pinney PC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
October 9, 2009 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 302 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 304 Motion (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
September 8, 2009 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing specified documents to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/4/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
April 17, 2009 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing further case management conference and statement re 287 Stipulation filed by Michele Medrano. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
September 29, 2008 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: class notice amendments (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 19, 2008 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amend class notice (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 16, 2008 279 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER (USCA # 08-80094) : The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court's 5/30/08 order granting class action certification. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno et al v. AutoZone, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?