DeHart v. Pfizer, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv04491
Filed: November 3, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/22/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
November 10, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2005 02:15 PM. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/8/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2005)
November 3, 2005 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2006 08:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeHart v. Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?