Caverhill et al v. General Electric Company et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04510
Filed: November 4, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by Joseph Lujan. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/25/2014. Joseph M. Lujan terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
September 25, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Hon. William Alsup no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 2, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 49 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 31, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Case Remanded from Eastern District of Pennsylvania MDL 875 (dtm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
November 4, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caverhill et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?