Fleury et al v. Cartier International et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04525
Filed: November 7, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2011 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 475 Andre and Sacha Fleury's Request for Leave to File "Motion for Wrongdoing by Cartier/Richemont." Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
April 28, 2010 367 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING FROM 6/2/10 to 6/23/10 re 366 Stipulation filed by Mike Mertaban, Liz Hart, Dennis Warner, Charles Cleves. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/28/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 24, 2009 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 358 Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
January 12, 2009 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 343 Letter filed by Mike Mertaban, Liz Hart, Dennis Warner, Charles Cleves reinstating 4/1/09 hearing on motion for attorney's fees.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/12/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
December 8, 2008 337 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 335 Stipulation filed by Mike Mertaban, Liz Hart, Dennis Warner, Charles Cleves. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 4, 2008 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 287 Sacha Fleury's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 21, 2008 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 296 Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 23, 2008 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Issues re 296 Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Issues re 289 Flynn Williams's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 12, 2008 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Sur-Reply for 296 Settling Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleury et al v. Cartier International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?