Chu v. Wells Fargo Investments LLC

Case Number: 3:2005cv04526
Filed: November 4, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The joint motion for final settlement approval is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees is granted in the amount of $1,725,000 plus $40,528.08 in costs, to be divided as agreed among counsel. Plaintiffs' motion for enhancement awards is granted in the amount of $10,000 each to Chu and Bulow and $4,000 each to Calforda, King and Turkisher. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/15/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 5, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending filing deadline to and including 1/24/2011 to file joint motion for approval of class action settlement; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 2, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DATES related to preliminary approval of class settlement; Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/2/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
September 7, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting (104) Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
June 22, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting leave to file 3rd amended complaint; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/21/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
December 18, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER staying all deadlines pending completion of mediation; Parties to notify Court within ten days after completion of mediation; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/17/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 9, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 12/21/2009 for filing of dispositive motions; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/9/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
October 27, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 10/28/2009 for filing of corrected 2nd amended complaint; Answer to be filed within ten thereafter; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/26/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 24, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 82 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint adding Tamara Turkisher, Lebrone King, and Tom Calforda as additional class respresentatives (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
February 4, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending mediation deadline to and including 3/31/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/2/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 8, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline to 1/19/2009 to complete mediation; Parties to submit further proposed revised deadlines within ten days thereafter; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/8/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
October 15, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING DEADLINES: All previous deadlines vacated pending completion of mediation; MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED BY 1/15/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/15/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chu v. Wells Fargo Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?