Identity Arts, LLC v. Best Buy Enterprise Service, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04656
Filed: November 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Previously Pending Motion as Moot. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/19/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
September 16, 2009 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
June 11, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/11/09. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/17/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING DECISION BY THE COURT OF APPEAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/12/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
December 5, 2005 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2006 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/5/05. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Identity Arts, LLC v. Best Buy Enterprise Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?