Shemano-Krupp v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company

Case Number: 3:2005cv04693
Filed: November 15, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 129 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
February 26, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request For Telephonic Appearance At Settlement Conference (by Plaintiff). Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/26/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING 121 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 25, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 19, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 118 Stipulation Regarding Deposition of Plaintiff Aimee Shemano-Krupp. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 17, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 29, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/29/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 26, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
September 15, 2008 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 92 Motion for Summary Judgment (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shemano-Krupp v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?