Whitworth v. Fidelity Mortgage Company et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04725
Filed: November 17, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AND JUDGEMENT THEREON by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
December 15, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 101 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT JOEL ATWATER filed by Judith Whitworth Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2009. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/15/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
September 28, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/22/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/28/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 3, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING & REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING re 101 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANT JOEL ATWATER filed by Judith Whitworth. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
May 27, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE re 99 Order Dismissing Case, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Evidentiary Hearing,,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 5, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/4/2009:the court GRANTS plaintiff's motion for default judgment and REFERS the matter to Magistrate Judge Maria Elena James pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C) for the purpose of conducting an evidentiary hearing and submitting a report and recommendation on the amount of damages and costs to be awarded.(awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 2, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS re 88 Notice (Other) filed by Judith Whitworth. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 27, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINES re 86 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
January 6, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 85 Status Report filed by Judith Whitworth. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
November 17, 2008 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED STATUS REPORT BY 1/14/2009. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/17/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 13, 2008 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitworth v. Fidelity Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?