Hare v. G.D. Searle, LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04735
Filed: November 17, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Clarice Hare terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
August 31, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re (3096 in M:05-cv-01699-CRB) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Martha Taylor, Richard Croft and filed by Patrick Haynes, Junior Counts, Robert C. Duke, Kay Goins, Juana Lopez, Heathere Ralph, Louise Bush, Paul R. Click, James A. White, James Boatwright, Jonathan Halley, Merlvin Perkins, Clara Olmsted, Pearly Belcher, Clarice Hare, John Sousan, Will Bass, Sr., Timothy Clawson, Bobby Jo Simbulan, Lecia D. Nolan, Mary Hicks, Shirley A. Allen, Anita P. Mackey, Jean M. Benham, Tracy Duke. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 19, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (15 in 3:06-cv-07628-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (3110 in M:05-cv-01699-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc., (16 in 3:08-cv-01858-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (36 in 3:06-cv-02101-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (63 in 3 :05-cv-04779-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc, (8 in 3:07-cv-00056-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc., (16 in 3:06-cv-02646-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (54 in 3:06-cv-02443-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (38 in 3:06-cv-00087-CRB) Resp onse filed by Pfizer Inc, (39 in 3:06-cv-00087-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc, (67 in 3:05-cv-04781-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc, (80 in 3:06-cv-02081-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (19 in 3:06-cv-02436-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, In c., (9 in 3:05-cv-04735-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (81 in 3:06-cv-02081-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (9 in 3:06-cv-04046-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (40 in 3:06-cv-00087-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc, (33 in 3:06-cv-024 34-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (15 in 3:08-cv-01858-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (55 in 3:06-cv-02443-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (35 in 3:06-cv-02101-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (26 in 3:06-cv-06081-CRB) Response f iled by Pfizer, Inc., (8 in 3:06-cv-02864-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (9 in 3:06-cv-01689-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (68 in 3:05-cv-04781-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer Inc, (15 in 3:06-cv-01901-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc., (43 in 3:06-cv-02431-CRB) Response filed by Pfizer, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/18/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
July 31, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (3097 in M:05-cv-01699-CRB) MOTION to Seal filed by Martha Taylor and filed by Patrick Haynes, Junior Counts, Robert C. Duke, Kay Goins, Juana Lopez, Heathere Ralph, Louise Bush, Paul R. Click, James A. White, James Boatwright, Jonathan Halley, Merlvin Perkins, Clara Olmsted, Pearly Belcher, Clarice Hare, Richard Croft, John Sousan, Will Bass, Sr., Timothy Clawson, Bobby Jo Simbulan, Lecia D. Nolan, Mary Hicks, Shirley A. Allen, Anita P. Mackey, Jean M. Benham, Tracy Duke. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/31/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
November 28, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2005 02:15 PM. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/8/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hare v. G.D. Searle, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?